Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Galeazzo Florimonte

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1478Born
4 May 154365.0AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
22 Oct 155274.4AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
1565¹86.6ResignedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
156788.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Galeazzo Florimonte (VIAF: 54488211)
Bishop Galeazzo Florimonte (born , died 1567) Bishop Emeritus of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSessa Aurunca

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 114, and Page 305
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1543, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018