Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Fleming

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1419AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
28 Apr 1420Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
14 Feb 1424AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
25 Jan 1431DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Richard Fleming:
Bishop Richard Fleming (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 10.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,453
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 306, and Page 233
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013