Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Fitzsimons

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1695¹Born
21 Dec 171823.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Dec 171823.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 176368.6SelectedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
20 Sep 176368.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
2 Oct 176974.7DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Fitzsimons
Archbishop Patrick Fitzsimons (born 1695, died ) Archbishop of Dublin

  • a priest for 50.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Aug 2020

Quantcast