Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Domenico Fiorina, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Consolata Missionaries


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1904²Born
23 Jan 192723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
1 Sep 194945.6AppointedSuperior General of Consolata Missionaries
196965.0ResignedSuperior General of Consolata Missionaries
23 Apr 199086.3DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Consolata Missionaries

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Fiorina
Father Domenico Fiorina I.M.C. (born 1904, died ) Superior General Emeritus of Consolata Missionaries

  • a priest for 63.2 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast