Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi de Filippi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1619³Born
19 Apr 168464.6SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
3 Jul 168464.8ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
5 Jan 168565.3DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi de Filippi
Bishop Luigi de Filippi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 323
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,684, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast