Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Figueroa, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1634³Born
24 Jan 168551.0SelectedBishop of Tropea, Italy
9 Apr 168551.2ConfirmedBishop of Tropea, Italy
4 Oct 169157.7DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Figueroa
Bishop Francisco de Figueroa O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedinaceli, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 392
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 226, Number 1,406
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast