Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltasar de Figueroa, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1634Born
10 May 168348.3AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
8 Sep 168449.6DiedBishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Baltasar de Figueroa
Bishop Baltasar de Figueroa O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaén, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 225, Number 1,394
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,683, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast