Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccol˛ Fieschi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Savona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524¹Born
12 Feb 154622.1AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
4 Sep 156137.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
1562¹38.0ResignedBishop of Savona, Italy
15 Dec 156440.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Fieschi
Bishop Niccol˛ Fieschi (born 1524) Bishop Emeritus of Savona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 292
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 266
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,546, Number 4*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast