Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Fernández Velasco

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Nov 1505AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
22 Dec 1505AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
22 Jul 1514AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
1520²DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Fernández Velasco
Bishop Juan Fernández Velasco (died 1520) Bishop of Palencia

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 22, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 154, and Page 145
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,505, Number 32*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast