Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristóbal Fernández Valtodano

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1561AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
20 Feb 1570AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
14 Nov 1572DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Fernández Valtodano (VIAF: 305430740)
Archbishop Cristóbal Fernández Valtodano (died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontiveros, Diocese of Ávila

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 71, Number 414
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267, and Page 173
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 23*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018