Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Fertitta

Deceased

Bishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1786Born
9 Mar 181125.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 184357.6SelectedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
25 Jan 184458.0ConfirmedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
31 Oct 187387.7DiedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Fertitta
Bishop Salvatore Fertitta (born , died ) Bishop of Cava e Sarno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCefalu

  • a priest for 62.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 143
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast