Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonio Ferrándiz Morales, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect of San Andrés y Providencia

Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1928BornAlbaida, Spain
29 Jun 195628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Mar 197243.8AppointedPrefect of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia
10 Nov 199870.5DiedPrefect of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ferrándiz Morales:
Priest Antonio Ferrándiz Morales O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect of San Andrés y Providencia

  • a priest for 42.4 years

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013