Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Ferrer

Deceased

Bishop of Tui, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591²Born
10 Sep 165665.6SelectedBishop of Tui, Spain
12 Mar 165766.1ConfirmedBishop of Tui, Spain
12 Aug 165766.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
23 Mar 165968.2DiedBishop of Tui, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Ferrer
Bishop Miguel Ferrer (born 1591, died ) Bishop of Tui

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona

  • a bishop for 1.6 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,147
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 188, Number 1,178
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 349
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018