Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Enrico de Ferrari, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Prefect of Alto Orinoco

Priest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1875BornNovara, Italy
21 May 189923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Nov 193257.0AppointedPrefect of Alto Orinoco, Venezuela
3 Aug 194569.7DiedPrefect of Alto Orinoco, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Enrico de Ferrari:
Priest Enrico de Ferrari S.D.B. (born , died ) Prefect of Alto Orinoco

  • a priest for 46.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013