Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Ferrari

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1632Born
29 Jun 165725.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jul 165725.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 169057.9AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
11 May 169967.0DiedBishop of Aquino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ferrari
Bishop Giovanni Ferrari (born , died ) Bishop of Aquino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeprani

  • a priest for 41.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 94
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,690, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast