Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santo de Ferrara, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ploaghe, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Feb 1430AppointedBishop of Ploaghe, Italy
12 Jun 1430Ordained BishopBishop of Ploaghe, Italy
1442²DiedBishop of Ploaghe, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Santo de Ferrara
Bishop Santo de Ferrara O.P. (died 1442) Bishop of Ploaghe

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 403
  • b: CB, 18 Aug 2019
  • ob/c23: CB, 2 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 3 Oct 2020

Quantcast