Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo de Ferrari

Deceased

Bishop of Bitonto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1618³Born
24 Apr 167859.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 May 167859.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 168970.4AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
Nov 1698³79.8DiedBishop of Bitonto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo de Ferrari
Bishop Carlo de Ferrari (born , died Nov 1698) Bishop of Bitonto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta

  • a priest for 20.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 121
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018