Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Dionisio Fernández Portocarrero

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹Born
28 Jan 163671.0AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
16 Jul 164075.5AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
27 Nov 164176.9DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Dionisio Fernández Portocarrero
Bishop Juan Dionisio Fernández Portocarrero (born 1565, died ) Bishop of Cádiz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarchena

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,054
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 192, and Page 198
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 163, Number 1,027
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast