Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Fernandes Sardinha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497²BornEvora
25 Feb 155154.1AppointedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
7 Feb 155255.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
22 Jun 155255.5InstalledBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
2 Jun 155659.4ResignedBishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
16 Jun 155659.5DiedBishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Fernandes Sardinha:
Bishop Pedro Fernandes Sardinha (died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ab/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,152

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013