Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Fernández Manrique

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
22 Jun 153030.4AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
14 Dec 153030.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
11 Apr 153737.2AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
20 Dec 153838.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 154040.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
7 Oct 154040.7DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Fernández Manrique
Pedro Cardinal Fernández Manrique (born 1500, died ) Bishop of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAguilar de Campóo

  • a cardinal for 1.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1538
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 149, and Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 178
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 42, Number 206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast