Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Andrés Fernandez de Ipenza

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Feb 1643SelectedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
5 Oct 1643ConfirmedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
24 Oct 1643DiedBishop-Elect of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Andrés Fernandez de Ipenza:
Father Andrés Fernandez de Ipenza (died ) Bishop-Elect of Yucatán (Mérida)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 245, Number 36
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015