Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Fernández del Toro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1663BornAguilar
21 Mar 170743.9AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
Jul 1719³56.2ResignedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
11 Apr 173370.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Fernández del Toro:
Bishop José Fernández del Toro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oviedo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 300
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 26, Number 54
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015