Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Blas Fernández de Toledo

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Sep 1343AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
1344²Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
17 Jun 1353AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
7 Mar 1362DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Blas Fernández de Toledo:
Archbishop Blas Fernández de Toledo (died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 487, and Page 386
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 303, Number 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014