Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Clemente Fernández, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa), Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1879Born
17 Nov 189516.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Sep 190323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Sep 191333.8AppointedPrefect of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa), Taiwan
Jun 1921³41.6ResignedPrefect of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa), Taiwan
28 Apr 195272.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa), Taiwan

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clemente Fernández
Father Clemente Fernández O.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Formosa Island {Isola Formosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenerudes, Diocese of Oviedo, Spain
Death PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain

  • a priest for 48.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast