Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Aniceto Fernández Alonso, O.P. †

Deceased

Master General Emeritus of Order of Friars Preachers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1895Born
1915²19.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Feb 192125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
Jun 1962³67.1AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
1974²78.7CeasedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Feb 198185.8DiedMaster General Emeritus of Order of Friars Preachers

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aniceto Fernández Alonso
Father Aniceto Fernández Alonso O.P. (born , died ) Master General Emeritus of Order of Friars Preachers

EventPlace
Birth PlacePardesivil de Curueño, Diocese of León, Spain
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 59.9 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast