Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Fedele Gonzaga

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522¹Born
2 Jun 155028.4AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
28 Nov 157452.9AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
8 Sep 158361.6DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Fedele Gonzaga (VIAF: 88995501)
Bishop Marco Fedele Gonzaga (born 1522, died ) Bishop of Mantova

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 234, and Page 92
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018