Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Federici

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1516¹Born
12 Feb 155236.1AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
6 Jul 156246.5AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
1569²53.0ResignedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
15 Jun 157357.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
6 Aug 157660.5AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
29 Jun 157761.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
8 Dec 157963.9DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Federici (VIAF: 33681464)
Bishop Girolamo Federici (born 1516, died ) Bishop of Lodi

Source(s):
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 265
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 220, and Page 237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016