Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Fedeli

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1641BornUrbino
17 Apr 169048.4AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
20 Feb 169654.2AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
7 Apr 171573.3DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Fedeli:
Bishop Alessandro Fedeli (died ) Bishop of Jesi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 71, and Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013