Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Fasolo

Deceased

Bishop of Feltre, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Feb 1457AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
7 Nov 1459AppointedBishop of Modon (Medone, Methone), Greece
16 Sep 1464AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
1490¹DiedBishop of Feltre, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Fasolo
Bishop Angelo Fasolo (died 1490) Bishop of Feltre

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 153, and Page 197
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast