Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Fernández de Angulo Saavedra y Luna

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1508AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
30 Sep 1510AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
21 Jun 1516DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín Fernández de Angulo Saavedra y Luna
Bishop Martín Fernández de Angulo Saavedra y Luna (died ) Bishop of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 26, Number 72
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 154, and Page 178
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,508, Number 40*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast