Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaetano Cardinal Fantuzzi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1708BornGualdo, Italy
24 Sep 175951.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175951.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
6 Apr 176758.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
1 Oct 177870.2DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Fantuzzi:
Cardinal Gaetano Fantuzzi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

  • a cardinal for 19.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013