Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Egidio Falcetta de Cingulo

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Mar 1542AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
30 Jan 1563AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
1 Jul 1564DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Egidio Falcetta de Cingulo:
Bishop Egidio Falcetta de Cingulo (died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 140, and Page 151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013