Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Falconieri

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1657Born
11 Sep 172467.5Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 172467.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
26 Jan 173476.9DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Falconieri
Alessandro Cardinal Falconieri (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1724

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast