Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Angelo Maria Ettinger, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1867Born
21 Dec 188922.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jun 189325.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Feb 191042.5AppointedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
29 Jun 191850.9DiedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Ettinger (VIAF: 19145244295674481240)
Abbot Angelo Maria Ettinger O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuxemburg, Vicariate Apostolic of Luxembourg
Death PlaceMontecassino, Abbey, Montecassino, Territorial Abbey of Montecassino
Buried Place (Original)Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Abbey, Badia di Cava, Territorial Abbey of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni

  • a priest for 25.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • loc: AM, 11 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast