Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joćo Afonso Cardinal Esteves

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1340¹Born
11 May 138949.3AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
15 Feb 139151.1AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
25 Feb 139959.1AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
29 May 140262.4AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
6 Jun 141171.4Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jun 141171.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
23 Jan 141575.0DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo Afonso Esteves
Joćo Afonso Cardinal Esteves (born 1340, died ) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAzambuja, Castle, Lisboa, Diocese of Lisboa
Death PlaceBrugge, Belgium
Buried Place (Original)Sćo Salvador, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a cardinal for 3.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jun 1411
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 452, and Page 406
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 196, and Page 507

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast