Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Espés

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Feb 1507AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
Jun 1507²Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
6 Sep 1508ResignedBishop of Gerona, Spain
18 Apr 1515AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
24 Oct 1530DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Espés
Bishop Juan de Espés (died ) Bishop of Urgell

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 23.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,470
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 202, and Page 324
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 24, Number 56
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1507, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast