Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantin Eruli

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Dec 1462AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
8 Jan 1472AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
8 Dec 1474AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
1500²DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Constantin Eruli
Bishop Constantin Eruli (died 1500) Bishop of Spoleto

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast