Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Wolfger von Erla

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1191AppointedBishop of Passau, Germany
9 Jun 1191Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 1191Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
24 Jun 1204AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
10 Feb 1218DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Wolfger von Erla
Patriarch Wolfger von Erla (died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 392, and Page 99
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,787

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast