Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berenguer de Eril, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1369AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
12 Aug 1369Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
20 Sep 1370AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
3 May 1387DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Berenguer de Eril:
Bishop Berenguer de Eril O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 128, and Page 510
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,980
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,566

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013