Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Ercolani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alatri


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Apr 1528AppointedAdministrator of Alatri, Italy
1530¹ResignedAdministrator of Alatri, Italy
1 Jul 1530AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
10 Jul 1530Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
1535¹ResignedBishop of Alatri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Ercolani:
Bishop Filippo Ercolani Bishop Emeritus of Alatri

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 99
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 8,353
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 16,993

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013