Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent-Michel Eon de Cély

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Apt, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1735³Born
15 Nov 177843.2SelectedBishop of Apt, France
14 Dec 177843.2ConfirmedBishop of Apt, France
10 Jan 177943.3Ordained BishopBishop of Apt, France
11 Nov 180166.1ResignedBishop of Apt, France
6 Dec 181580.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Apt, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Laurent-Michel Eon de Cély
Bishop Laurent-Michel Eon de Cély (born Sep 1735, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Apt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBayeux

  • a bishop for 36.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 91
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018