Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Enguera, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1505AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
9 Dec 1510AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
1 Oct 1512AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
14 Feb 1513DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Enguera:
Bishop Juan de Enguera O.P. (died ) Bishop of Tortosa

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 22, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 332, and Page 212
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013