Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Englmayr

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Mar 1561SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
19 Nov 1561ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
19 Nov 1561AppointedTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)
13 Jul 1568DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Michael Englmayr
Bishop Michael Englmayr (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 307
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 40*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018