Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Engelpert

Deceased

Bishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Mar 1477AppointedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
25 Mar 1477Ordained BishopBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
17 Feb 1491DiedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

MicroData Summary for Pierre Engelpert
Bishop Pierre Engelpert (died ) Bishop of Wiener Neustadt

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria dell’Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 130
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,929
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,304
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1477, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast