Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Elvino

Deceased

Bishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1504Born
20 Dec 154238.5AppointedBishop of Anglona, Italy
8 Aug 154541.2AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
25 Nov 154541.5Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
11 Jul 154844.1DiedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Elvino
Bishop Bernardino Elvino (born , died ) Bishop of Anglona-Tursi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlvito
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 110
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Oct 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast