Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Elphinstone

Deceased

Bishop of Aberdeen, Scotland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1431¹Born
1456¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 148150.6AppointedBishop of Ross (Rosemarkie, Fortrose), Scotland, Great Britain
19 Mar 148352.2AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Oct 151483.8DiedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Elphinstone:
Bishop William Elphinstone (died ) Bishop of Aberdeen

  • a priest for 58.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013