Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Philipp Adolf von Ehrenberg

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1583Born
6 Feb 162339.3SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
19 Mar 162440.4ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
16 Jul 163147.8DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp Adolf von Ehrenberg (VIAF: 64819666)
Father Philipp Adolf von Ehrenberg (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeinsheim

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 201
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast