Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Enrique (Henry) Ederle, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Mindoro, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1895Born
21 Jun 194650.7AppointedPrefect of Mindoro, Philippines
12 Jul 195155.7ResignedPrefect of Mindoro, Philippines
17 Jul 197074.7DiedPrefect Emeritus of Mindoro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Enrique (Henry) Ederle
Father Enrique (Henry) Ederle S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Mindoro

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018