Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mikołaj Dzierżgowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490¹Born
20 May 154151.3AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
31 May 154252.4AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
30 Mar 154353.2AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
19 Feb 154656.1AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
22 Feb 155969.1DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Dzierżgowski (VIAF: 49629756)
Archbishop Mikołaj Dzierżgowski (born 1490, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336, and Page 204
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 164, and Page 148
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 14*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018