Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos de Vilches y Cabrera

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1715¹Born
27 Mar 176550.2AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
24 Jun 176550.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
14 Apr 177459.2DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos de Vilches y Cabrera
Bishop Juan Carlos de Vilches y Cabrera (born 1715, died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNueva Segovia, Guatemala

  • a bishop for 8.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,765, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 308

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast